DE SB227 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill seeks to establish two chapters: Section 1, Chapter 65 that creates “Quality Assessment Fees” for the nursing home or long term care (LTC) provider community, and Section 2, Chapter 105 that establishes a new “Quality Assessment Fund.” The fees collected under this bill, through a formula established in the legislation, will be placed into the Fund, which will in turn then be matched by federal Medicaid dollars. The Fund, administered by the Department of Finance, will then return 90% of the total local and federal dollars to the LTC providers through increased re-imbursement rates for the care of their Medicaid eligible patients/residents. The bill exempts Continuing Care Retirement Communities as defined in the bill, and those LTC facilities with less than 46 beds. The fees collected under this legislation will be sunsetted by December 31, 2015, unless re-authorized by the Delaware Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Delaware Code By Creating A New Chapter 65 Of Title 30 Of The Delaware Code To Impose Quality Assessment Fees On Nursing Facilities And By Creating A New Chapter 105 Of Title 16 Establishing The Nursing Facility Quality Assessment Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-28 Signed by Governor
2012-06-14 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 12 On Its Merits
2012-06-12 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2012-06-07 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 1 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2012-05-16 Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback