DE SB223 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act adopts the Uniform Law Commissions Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act (Revised Act), revising Chapter 54, Title 24 of the Delaware Code, which is based on the Uniform Law Commissions Uniform Athlete Agents Act (Uniform Act).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Athlete Agents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
2018-06-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-07 Amendment SA 1 to SB 223 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback