DE SB223 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on July 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on July 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Meningococcal disease is an easily transmitted and potentially fatal bacterial infection. In accordance with the latest recommendations of the Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices of the Centers for Disease Control, this Act updates Delaware’s goal of preventing meningococcal disease by requiring that students who wish to enroll in a post-secondary educational institutions with campus housing receive vaccination against meningococcal disease. This Act authorizes students to request exemption from the vaccination requirement, and authorizes each post-secondary educational institution to develop its own policies and procedures regarding the determinations of such requests. The post-secondary education institutions’ policies and procedures must include a requirement that, if the student seeking an exemption is a minor, the student’s parent or guardian shall sign the request for exemption. Paragraph (g)(3) authorizes post-secondary educational institutions to determine the appropriate office and position within the office to receive, record, maintain, make determinations about, and notify students of the determination of their requests for exemption. Whereas post-secondary education institutions were already required under 509 of Title 16 to provide students with information about meningococcal disease and the availability of vaccination against the disease, this Act requires post-secondary educational institutions to also provide students with information about the requirement that they receive, within 5 years prior to enrollment, vaccination against the disease. Furthermore, this Act reorganizes the existing requirement, along with the new requirement, into the new subsection (g)(1). Post-secondary education institutions were also already required under 509 to develop procedures for facilitating, receiving, and recording student responses to the information provided about meningococcal disease and vaccination against the disease. This Act adds that post-secondary educational institutions must also facilitate, receive, and record students’ vaccination records. Furthermore, this Act reorganizes the existing requirement, along with the new requirement, into the new subsection (g)(2). Finally, this Act makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the guidelines of the Delaware Legislative Manual. Author: Senator Hall-Long
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Meningitis Prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2016-04-20 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |