DE SB222 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill combines the functions of the Delaware Heritage Commission and the Council on Archives into a single entity, the Delaware Heritage Commission. It reduces the combined total membership of the two entities from 27 to 15 members appointed by the Governor. In addition to the appointed members, it provides for two ex officio members: (1) the Director of the Delaware Public Archives, who shall have voting powers by virtue of his administrative responsibility for the Delaware Heritage Office and the responsibilities of his office under regulations established by the National Historical Publications and Records Commission of the National Archives and Records Administration; and (2) the Director of the Division of Historical and Cultural Affairs, who shall remain a non-voting member. In addition, the Heritage Commission shall have the authority to appoint such other representatives of government agencies and nonprofit organizations as it deems appropriate to be ex officio, nonvoting members. The Commission may also create subcommittees, which may consist of non-members, to facilitate its work. The bill also makes insertions and deletions to incorporate the powers and duties of the former Council on Archives into the responsibilities of the Commission and to update obsolete language to better define the present role of the Commission.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Heritage Commission And The Council On Archives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-30 | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken | |
2012-06-26 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-12 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2012-06-07 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-07 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-05-17 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |