DE SB222 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill establishes the pilotage rates for the Pilot’s Association for the Bay and River Delaware for 2011, 2012 and 2013.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 23 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Pilotage Rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-06 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-04-21 | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-04-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |
2010-04-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |