DE SB221 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Laid On Table in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act is the first leg of a constitutional amendment that modernizes the Delaware Constitutions bail provision and clarifies the power of the General Assembly and the Courts to define certain felony offenses for which, or circumstances under which, pretrial release on bail may not be available.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Proposing An Amendment To Article I, § 12 Of The Delaware Constitution Relating To Criminal Procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-06-27 Roll Call Rescinded in Senate
2018-06-27 Reconsidered in Senate
2018-06-20 Defeated By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 8 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2018-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback