DE SB221 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on August 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act is designed to further promote the purpose of 16 Del. C. Chapter 96 (as amended). The intent is to advance the number of work opportunities made available to Delawareans with disabilities beyond those offered through State Use Law by presenting employers incentives to employ this under-represented workforce. State Use Law is a publically supported employment program that serves to create employment to qualified persons with disabilities. By virtue of this Act, the spirit and purpose of State Use as a means to develop the skills necessary to gain employment in the private sector will be further enhanced and more employment outcomes will be realized for the population of persons with disabilities served by Vocational Rehabilitation Agencies. This legislation is patterned on legislation enacted in 2012 (H.B. No. 275) which authorized a similar tax credit for employers hiring qualified veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Delaware Tax Credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-29SenateSigned by Governor
2016-06-30HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-15HouseReported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 12 On Its Merits
2016-06-09HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
2016-06-08SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-05-19SenateReported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2016-03-24SenateAssigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback