DE SB221 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill updates the statute that allows the Division of Developmental Disabilities Services to authorize surgical procedures for persons receiving residential services from the Division. It expands the range of potentially available relatives to authorize elective surgery for persons receiving services from the Division of Developmental Disabilities Services. It expands the scope of the authorization to diagnostic procedures and corrects the statutory definition of who is covered by this law.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Mental Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Barbieri [D] | Rep. Edward Bennett [D] | Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] |
Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Nick Manolakos [R] | Rep. Teresa Schooley [D] | Sen. Liane Sorenson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2010-06-24 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |