DE SB22 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 17 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Act enacts the National Popular Vote compact, which changes the Electoral College from an institution that reflects the voters state-by-state choices into a body that reflects the voters nationwide choice. Currently, state statutes require that electoral votes are controlled by the plurality of the voters in the state but this system is not required by the U.S. Constitution or federal law. The National Popular Vote compact requires that each member state award its electoral votes to the presidential candidate who received the largest number of popular votes in all 50 states and the District of Columbia. The National Popular Vote compact becomes effective when it is enacted by states collectively possessing a majority of the electoral votes. When the National Popular Vote compact takes effect, the presidential candidate receiving the most popular votes in all 50 states and the District of Columbia would be guaranteed enough electoral votes in the Electoral College to be elected to the Presidency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating The Agreement Among The States To Elect The President By National Popular Vote.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 17 NO
2019-03-13 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 On Its Merits
2019-03-08 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2019-03-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO
2019-03-06 Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2019-02-27 Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback