DE SB22 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill allows first responders to use reasonable force to remove an animal confined in a motor vehicle under conditions likely to cause suffering, injury or death. The bill also allows a person removing an animal to use reasonable means to contact the owner and if unable to locate the owner, take the animal to an animal shelter. The bill provides for issuance of a fine in an amount no higher than $1,000 for a first offense.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Related To Cruelty To Animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2015-04-01 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |