DE SB218 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill amends Title 24 of the Delaware Code by changing the qualifications for a Professional Art Therapists. For those graduating with a master's degree prior to January 2013, a master's degree from an accredited educational institution in an art therapy program that was either approved by the American Art Therapy Association or accredited by the Commission on Accreditation of Allied Health Education Programs at the time the degree was conferred is required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Ammend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Licensure Of Art Therapists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04 Signed by Governor
2018-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
2018-06-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback