DE SB218 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill amends the definition of good cause to include reported and recorded acts of Bullying as previously defined in Delaware Code. This definition change would allow bullying along with the other factors currently listed under “good cause” to terminate the 1 year charter agreement or 2 year district choice agreement required by law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Good Cause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-15SenateSigned by Governor
2014-06-30HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-06-17HouseReported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2014-05-29HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
2014-05-15SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-05-15SenateAmendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-05-14SenateReported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2014-05-13SenateAmendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2014-05-08SenateAssigned to Education Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback