DE SB216 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act strengthens the shelter requirements for dogs that are kept outside by requiring the following:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 And Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Cruelty To Dogs And Specifications For The Humane Handling, Care, And Treatment Of Dogs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2018-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-28 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2018-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 6 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-06-27 Amendment SA 1 to SB 216 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-27 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-06-27 Amendment SA 1 to SB 216 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-14 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback