DE SB214 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Division of Forensic Science (Division) produces numerous postmortem examination reports, autopsy reports, and laboratory reports annually. Given the high volume, and consistent with National Association of Medical Examiners accreditation standards, this Act expands the period of time within which the Medical Examiner must complete a written report from 30 to 90 days.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Division Of Forensic Science.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Sean Lynn [D] |
Rep. Stephen Smyk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-07-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 4 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-15 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2018-06-14 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |