DE SB213 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill adds representation from the Division of Medicaid and Medical Assistance (DMMA) to the Delaware Healthy Mother and Infant Consortium and the Overdose System of Care Committee.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Health And Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Sarah McBride [D] | Sen. Kyle Gay [D] | Rep. David Bentz [D] | Rep. Melissa Minor-Brown [D] |
Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-04-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-11 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2022-03-10 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-03-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |