DE SB213 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - Reported Out of Committee (MANUFACTURED HOUSING) in House with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - Reported Out of Committee (MANUFACTURED HOUSING) in House with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt manufactured homes on permanent foundations with rental agreements or land leases at least 40 years in term and that permit rent increases no more than once a year from Chapter 70 of Title 25.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Manufactured Homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (MANUFACTURED HOUSING) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-21 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-06-07 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-05-17 | Introduced and Assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee in House | |
2012-05-16 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (SMALL BUSINESS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2012-05-03 | Assigned to Small Business Committee in Senate |