DE SB210 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act amends the Charter of Lewes to give the City Council the authority to impose and collect a lodging tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Charter Of Lewes Relating To The Power To Impose And Collect A Lodging Tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2020-06-24 Suspension of Rules in House
2020-06-23 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2020-06-23 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-06-23 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2020-01-29 Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback