DE SB21 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This bill vests the authority for regulating seed in Delaware with the Delaware Department of Agriculture and repeals any inconsistent act or parts of acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Agriculture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08 Signed by Governor
2017-05-02 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-29 Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House
2017-03-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-03-28 Amendment SA 1 to SB 21 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-03-28 Amendment SA 1 to SB 21 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-22 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2017-01-26 Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback