DE SB209 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires the Department of Education to promulgate regulations to further define the meaning and process for consideration of impact in the charter school application review process, to be considered and approved by the State Board no later than its October 2014 meeting. It also clarifies the conditions that an authorizer may place on an approved application, and provides that the State Board of Education may place or modify conditions to address considerations of impact.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-03 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 24 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 9 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2014-05-13 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |