DE SB209 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides for a 10-year extension to the Historic Preservation Tax Credit Act which is scheduled to expire in June 2010. Seventy-five (75) historic buildings throughout the State have been rehabilitated and preserved for future generations as a result of this program. Since its inception in 2001, the State has awarded $34 million in tax credits that have leveraged more than $166 million in private-sector rehabilitation expenditures plus additional tens of millions in site acquisition investments. These investments have produced an estimated 2,400 jobs in Delaware – most of them in the construction trades and related industries.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Providing For An Extension Of The Historic Preservation Tax Credit Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-09 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-03 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-03 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-06-03 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2010-06-02 | Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-01 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2010-05-05 | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 4 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-04-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2010-04-27 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-04-27 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-04-27 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & TAXATION) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to Revenue & Taxation Committee in Senate |