DE SB208 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act makes the following changes to the large public works contract procedures in subsection (c) and (d) of ยง 6962 of Title 29 for all State agencies:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Public Works Contracting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-25 Signed by Governor
2018-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-19 Re-Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House
2018-06-13 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2018-06-12 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-12 Amendment SA 1 to SB 208 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-05-10 Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback