DE SB207 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 3 NO 3 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Substitute Act does all of the following:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Opposing Drilling Off Delaware's Coast And Directing Certain State Officials And State Agencies To Enforce Delaware's Rights Relating To Offshore Drilling Under Federal And State Environmental Laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 3 NO 3 ABSENT
2018-06-26 Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-22 Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
2018-06-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 2 NO 2 ABSENT
2018-06-21 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-19 Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 207, and Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback