DE SB206 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Far too many Delawareans have been personally affected by addiction and substance use disorder and have experienced the tragedy of watching loved ones suffer from this chronic disease. Nearly 2,000 individuals in Delaware suffered a non-fatal overdose in 2017, but data suggest that many of these individuals continued to be prescribed opioid pain medications or did not receive substance use disorder treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Prescription Monitoring Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2018-06-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-05-08 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback