DE SB206 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Far too many Delawareans have been personally affected by addiction and substance use disorder and have experienced the tragedy of watching loved ones suffer from this chronic disease. Nearly 2,000 individuals in Delaware suffered a non-fatal overdose in 2017, but data suggest that many of these individuals continued to be prescribed opioid pain medications or did not receive substance use disorder treatment.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Prescription Monitoring Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-12 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2018-06-07 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate |