DE SB206 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act updates a general provision of the code to reflect current practice and conform with specific statutory language applicable to the appointment of a vacant office for a commissioner in the Superior Court or the Court of Common Pleas.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To General Provision Applicable To Vacancies In Office For Commissioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2016-06-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |