DE SB206 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Servicemembers have been afforded civil relief at the federal level under the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act, 50 U.S.C. App. 501 et seq. (the “SCRA”), or one of its predecessor statutes, since the Civil War. Similar to the purpose of the SCRA, this bill would provide for, strengthen, and expedite the national defense through protection extended to servicemembers of the United States to enable such persons to devote their entire energy to the defense needs of the Nation. However, this bill would significantly enhance the protections extended to those servicemembers who are residents of this State or stationed in this State by enacting certain SCRA protections as Delaware law and providing the Attorney General with enforcement authority over such protections. Nothing in this bill would change the requirements that already exist under the federal SCRA with respect to procedures required to be followed in civil actions in Delaware state courts involving those servicemembers. In addition, this bill would provide civil relief to members of the Delaware National Guard who are called into active military service for the State of Delaware for a period of more than 30 consecutive days, which constitutes a group of servicemembers not currently covered under the federal SCRA. Thus, this bill would keep Delaware current with the many other states that have extended SCRA protections to members of their National Guard called to state active duty.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Protecting Military Servicemembers From Abusive Practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (VETERANS AFFAIRS) in House with 15 On Its Merits |
2014-05-13 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |