DE SB205 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill outlines procedures for dealing with Sudden Cardiac Arrest in student athletes. This legislation will be known as the Grace Firestone Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Student Athletes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2014-05-14 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |