DE SB204 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Section 1 through 4 of this Act establish interim standards and criteria in order to permit redevelopment projects to move forward while revised regulations are being drafted. The interim standards set forth in this Act would effectively "sunset" upon the adoption of regulations governing redevelopment. The redevelopment regulations, upon formal adoption, would supersede the provisions of the Bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Stormwater Management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 6 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
2018-06-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2018-05-08 Introduced and Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback