DE SB204 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 through 4 of this Act establish interim standards and criteria in order to permit redevelopment projects to move forward while revised regulations are being drafted. The interim standards set forth in this Act would effectively "sunset" upon the adoption of regulations governing redevelopment. The redevelopment regulations, upon formal adoption, would supersede the provisions of the Bill.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Stormwater Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-12 | Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House | |
2018-06-07 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate |