DE SB202 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act ensures that the spouses of those killed in the line of duty are able to receive benefits for the remainder of their lives regardless of future marital status. When a surviving spouse remarries, the surviving spouse's benefit is reduced to 90% of the original benefit for the first 10 years after the remarrying and must be reduced to 75% of the original benefit thereafter until the death of the surviving spouse. Spouses of fallen first responders should not be forced to make decisions to carry on with their lives based on financial considerations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relatng To Workers' Compensation Benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27 Signed by Governor
2018-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2018-06-19 Assigned to Labor Committee in House
2018-06-19 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-19 Amendment SA 1 to SB 202 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-19 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2018-05-08 Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback