DE SB200 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act prohibits drilling for oil or natural gas in Delawares coastal zone and territorial waters and precludes DNREC from issuing any permits in connection with the development of offshore drilling infrastructure, whether proposed for Delaware territorial waters or waters outside of the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Offshore Drilling And The Coastal Zone.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-06-26 Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-22 Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
2018-06-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 1 NO 4 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2018-05-08 Introduced and Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback