DE SB200 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill increases the penalty for committing terroristic threatening that causes evacuation of a building, place of assembly, or facility of public transportation from a class G felony to a class E felony.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Terroristic Threatening.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2014-06-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |