DE SB200 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Fatal Incident Review Team is a multiagency team that reviews all deaths and near deaths that occur as a result of domestic violence. This Act reduces the core number of Review Team members from eight to seven, by eliminating the requirement that a representative from the Department of Education serve as a mandatory member of the Fatal Incident Review. The Department of Education would serve in an ad hoc role as needed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Fatal Incident Review Team.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2012-05-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2012-05-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2012-04-03 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |