DE SB20 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act clarifies that a person with a special license plate or permit for persons with disabilities may park for an unlimited period where the length of time is otherwise limited and must be able to park in a metered parking space for at least 1 hour. This Act clarifies that it is a violation of the state equal accommodations law to prohibit parking as authorized for a person with a special license plate or permit for persons with disabilities.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 And Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Parking.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] |
Sen. David Wilson [R] | Rep. Andria Bennett [D] | Rep. Shannon Morris [R] | Rep. Michael Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-18 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-04-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-19 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2021-03-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-03-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-01-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate |