DE SB20 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act is the second leg of a constitutional amendment that will limit the ability of the State to appropriate Transportation Trust Fund moneys to a purpose other than (1) capital expenditures on the public transportation system, including the road system, grants and allocations for investments in transportation, the transit system, and the support systems for public transportation; (2) payment of the interest and principal on all bonds issued before or after the effective date of this Act and secured by moneys in the Transportation Trust Fund; and (3) other transportation-related purposes, including operating expenses funding the Delaware Department of Transportation, to which moneys in the Transportation Trust Fund are authorized on the effective date of this Act. The first leg, Senate Bill No. 166 of the 148th General Assembly, was adopted by two-thirds of the members elected to the General Assembly and publicized in accordance with Article XVI, ยง 1 of the Delaware Constitution. This Act essentially creates a lock box on the Transportation Trust Fund that can only be opened by the agreement of three-fourths of all the members of each House through a bill separate from an annual budget act, bond and capital improvement act, or grants-in-aid act. Additionally, if moneys in the Transportation Trust Fund cease to be appropriated for a transportation-related purpose, the moneys may not again be appropriated to such purpose except by the agreement of three-fourths of all the members of each House through a bill separate from an annual budget act, bond and capital improvement act, or grants-in-aid act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concurring In A Proposed Amendment To Article Viii Of The Delaware Constitution Relating To The Transportation Trust Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18 Enact w/o Sign by Governor
2017-05-18 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2017-04-27 Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
2017-04-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2017-01-24 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback