DE SB20 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is the second leg of a constitutional amendment that will limit the ability of the State to appropriate Transportation Trust Fund moneys to a purpose other than (1) capital expenditures on the public transportation system, including the road system, grants and allocations for investments in transportation, the transit system, and the support systems for public transportation; (2) payment of the interest and principal on all bonds issued before or after the effective date of this Act and secured by moneys in the Transportation Trust Fund; and (3) other transportation-related purposes, including operating expenses funding the Delaware Department of Transportation, to which moneys in the Transportation Trust Fund are authorized on the effective date of this Act. The first leg, Senate Bill No. 166 of the 148th General Assembly, was adopted by two-thirds of the members elected to the General Assembly and publicized in accordance with Article XVI, ยง 1 of the Delaware Constitution. This Act essentially creates a lock box on the Transportation Trust Fund that can only be opened by the agreement of three-fourths of all the members of each House through a bill separate from an annual budget act, bond and capital improvement act, or grants-in-aid act. Additionally, if moneys in the Transportation Trust Fund cease to be appropriated for a transportation-related purpose, the moneys may not again be appropriated to such purpose except by the agreement of three-fourths of all the members of each House through a bill separate from an annual budget act, bond and capital improvement act, or grants-in-aid act.
Title
An Act Concurring In A Proposed Amendment To Article Viii Of The Delaware Constitution Relating To The Transportation Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Enact w/o Sign by Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2017-05-17 | Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-27 | Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2017-04-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2017-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2017-01-24 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate |