DE SB2 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

In order to lower the cost of energy and accelerate the adoption of community-based solar photovoltaic systems in the State, this bill eliminates current barriers to such systems and sets up a regulatory process to be implemented by the Public Service Commission with consumer protection provided by the Department of Justice. More specifically, this bill:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 6, 26, And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Community Owned Energy Generating Facilities And Renewable Energy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17 Signed by Governor
2021-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NO 2 ABSENT
2021-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in House with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2021-06-11 Assigned to Energy Committee in House
2021-06-10 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-06-09 Reported Out of Committee (Environment & Energy) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2021-06-03 Introduced and Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback