DE SB197 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act postpones the effective date of Senate Bill No. 67, enacted in 2019, from January 1, 2020, to July 1, 2020. The clerks of the peace for all 3 counties have indicated they intend to postpone implementation of Senate Bill No. 67, so as to allow additional time for engagement with leaders of faith communities to identify any additional changes to the marriage registry structure or to its implementation or enforcement.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 95, Volume 82 Of The Laws Of Delaware Relating To Marriages.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. Catherine Cloutier [R] | Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] | Rep. John Viola [D] |
Rep. Michael Ramone [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2020-01-17 | Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House | |
2020-01-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2020-01-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2019-12-19 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate |