DE SB197 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act provides mandatory expungement eligibility to individuals who were convicted of the possession, use or consumption of marijuana prior to Delawares decriminalization of these offenses. To be eligible for the mandatory expungement, the marijuana conviction must be the applicants only criminal conviction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Possession Of Marijuana, Possession Of Drug Paraphernalia And Expungement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-13 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2018-06-12 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-12 Amendment SA 1 to SB 197 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-07 Amendment SA 1 to SB 197 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-05-08 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback