DE SB196 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act authorizes the Town of Slaughter Beach to acquire real and personal property located inside and outside the boundaries of the Town of Slaughter Beach.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Slaughter Beach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2020-01-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2020-01-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2020-01-22 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2020-01-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2020-01-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-12-19 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |