DE SB195 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The societal implications of technological developments are pervasive, and the reach and influence of digital media platforms continue to expand. Media literacy skills are necessary for citizens to safely, responsibly, and critically consume and use social media and other forms of media. In addition, media literacy education prepares students to make informed civic decisions that affect them, their families, their communities, and the world.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Media Literacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 30 YES 11 NO | |
2022-01-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 4 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-20 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |
2022-01-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO | |
2022-01-20 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 195 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-01-06 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 195 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-23 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |