DE SB195 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act revises the Charter of Greenwood as follows:
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of Greenwood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2020-01-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2020-01-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2020-01-22 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2020-01-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2020-01-21 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 195 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2020-01-16 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 195 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2020-01-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-12-19 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |