DE SB195 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 of the Act addresses statutes under Chapter 49 of Title 10 and (i) amends the title of section 4915 (but makes no substantive changes to the statute); and (ii) modifies section 4916 to provide that plans similar to the Delaware College Investment Plan and the Delaware Achieving a Better Life Experience Plan, but created under the laws of other states, are similarly exempt from the execution or attachment process in Delaware.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 10, 12, 18, And 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Decedents Estates And Fiduciary Relations And Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-30 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2018-05-10 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |