DE SB195 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Assigned to Committee in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Assigned to Committee in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Charter Amendment changes the election date from March to April. It also allows a recorded map to define the territory instead of metes and bounds, and requires 30 days instead of 20 to register to run for Mayor or Council.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Blades Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Assigned to Committee in Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-03-18 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-18 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 Favorable | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2010-01-28 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-01-27 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-01-26 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |