DE SB193 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill updates the State of Delawares False Claims and Reporting Act to make it compliant with the requirements of Section 1909 of the Social Security Act. Section 1909 of the Social Security Act provides a financial incentive for States to enact laws that establish liability to the State for individuals and entities that submit false or fraudulent claims to the State Medicaid Program. This incentive provides for a ten percent increase in the share of a qui tam recovery or settlement apportioned to the State. For a State to qualify for this incentive, State law must meet certain requirements enumerated under Section 1909(b) of the Social Security Act, so that the States law is at least as effective as the Federal False Claims Act. After review by the Office of Inspector General for the United States Department of Health & Human Services (OIG-HHS), it was determined that Delawares current False Claims and Reporting Act fails to meet the requirements of Section 1909(b) of the Social Security Act. OIG-HHS has granted Delaware a two-year grace period, ending December 31, 2018, to address these deficiencies. This bill amends the False Claims and Reporting Act to bring it into compliance with the requirements of Section 1909(b).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware False Claims And Reporting Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13 Signed by Governor
2018-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
2018-06-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-05-03 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback