DE SB192 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill respectfully responds and reacts to the well-reasoned decision in the matter State of Delaware Insurance Coverage Office v. Rabrinda Choudry and Debjani Choudry, C.A. No. N12A-08-003 RRC and codifies the longstanding position of the State of Delaware that it is a self-insurer within the scope of 21 Del. C. 2904. Specifically, this Bill is intended to restore the State’s participation in Insurance Commissioner’s Arbitrations with respect to certain of its subrogation actions as required by 29 Del. C. 2118(g)(3).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Motor Vehicle Safety- Responsibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-06SenateSigned by Governor
2014-07-01HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-05-14HouseReported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2014-05-06HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
2014-05-01SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-05-01SenateReported Out of Committee (INSURANCE) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2014-04-09SenateAssigned to Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback