DE SB192 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Charter change adds the term “forfeitures” as creating a vacancy. Forfeitures are then defined and the procedures to determine a forfeiture are established.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Fenwick Relating To Town Council Vacancies And Forfeitures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 Favorable | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2010-01-28 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-01-27 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-01-14 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |