DE SB191 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-9)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Since the 14th Amendment to the United States Constitution was adopted on July 9, 1868, with Delaware ratifying it in 1901, at least 15 states have added a provision to their state constitution that prohibits the denial or abridgement of equal rights under the law based on race, color, or national origin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Proposing An Amendment To Article I Of The Delaware Constitution Relating To Equal Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2020-06-22 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2020-06-16 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2020-06-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-06-16 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2020-02-28 Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback