DE SB190 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Since the creation of the Delaware Heritage Greenway Council in 1992 which then became the Delaware Council on Greenways and Trails, creation and maintenance of greenways and trails have become an important part of the mission of the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control, and especially its parks system. This bill merges the work of the Council on Greenways and Trails with the Parks Advisory Council to formally join their efforts. The two councils already collaborate on the Outdoor Recreation Parks and Trails grant program. This bill expands the Parks Advisory Council and adds trails and greenways as a background sought for some parks council members, and also adds representatives from the General Assembly which the Council on Greenways and Trails has had but the Parks Advisory Council does not currently have.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Parks And Recreation Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-04-14 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2022-04-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-11 | Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House | |
2022-03-10 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-03-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment & Energy) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-17 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee in Senate |