DE SB19 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on January 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-01-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on January 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-01-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act will generate an additional $24.5 million in resources for the General Fund to help manage the $109.2 million budget shortfall for Fiscal Year 2009 projected at the December 2008 DEFAC meeting. This Act appropriates available premiums on bonds sold after January 1, 2009, appropriates certain Special Funds of the State, deposits certain funds to the General Fund and provides for General Fund reversions.
Title
An Act Appropriating Bond Premiums And Special Funds Of The State, Reverting Certain Funds Of The State; Depositing Certain Funds Of The State To The General Fund And Specifying Certain Conditions For The Expenditure Of Certain Funds; And Amending The Laws Of Delaware.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-01-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-01-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-01-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-01-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-01-29 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-01-29 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-01-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Capital Infrastructure Committee in House | |
2009-01-27 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-01-27 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-01-27 | Introduced in Senate |